MD SB377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "institution of initial eligibility" to include community colleges as eligible institutions as part of the criteria for applicants for the Teacher Development and Retention Program.
Title
Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {883027/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2024-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Smith, Wolek and Ghrist) |
2024-04-04 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2024-04-04 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza) |
2024-04-04 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-04 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators M. Washington, Lewis Young and Carozza) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553926/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB75 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Subjects
Apprentices
Certifications
Community Colleges
Education
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Independent Contractors
Job Training
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Certifications
Community Colleges
Education
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Independent Contractors
Job Training
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |