MD SB379 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or after October 1, 2022, an individual to be licensed by the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists before assisting in the practice of audiology in the State, except as otherwise provided under certain provisions of law; establishing qualifications to obtain an audiology assistant license; authorizing a licensed audiologist to provide general supervision for up to two licensed audiology assistants at any time; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2021-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606887/1 Adopted |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204132/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB161 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Ethics
Health Occupations
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Unfair Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Ethics
Health Occupations
Licenses
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 402.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 2-3A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |