MD SB386 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified pollinator habitat plan to include specified best management practices for the designation of specified habitat areas; requiring that a specified pollinator habitat plan established by the Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland Environmental Service, and the State Highway Administration be as protective of pollinators as the Department of Agriculture's managed pollinator protection plan; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, the use of specified pesticides, seeds, or plants in a specified area; etc.
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-26) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {683627/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-90) (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {173824/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-84) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {683627/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-90) (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {173824/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-84) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-26) |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {683627/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (46-90) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {173824/1 (Delegate McKay) Rejected (51-84) |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-6) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854233/1 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Bees
Environmental Service, Maryland
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Highway Administration, State
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pest Control
Transportation - Highways
Agriculture, Department of
Bees
Environmental Service, Maryland
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Highway Administration, State
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Pest Control
Transportation - Highways