MD SB389 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Cecil County to the list of jurisdictions in which the holder of a Class 6 pub-brewery license may sell malt beverages for off- premises consumption in sealed refillable containers under specified circumstances.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-09 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |