MD SB389 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB110
Note: Carry Over of previous SB608
Note: Carry Over of previous SB608
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain disciplinary matrix applies to all complaints of police misconduct; specifying that the purpose of a certain trial board process is to adjudicate all internal and external matters for which a police officer is subject to disciplin; requiring a trial board for a statewide or bicounty law enforcement agency, within 45 days of a final hearing, to issue a written decision reflecting the findings, conclusions, and recommendations of a majority of the trial board; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m. |
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743429/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743429/1 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB389 (Carry Over) 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
SB608 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
SB608 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appeals
Certifications
Collective Bargaining
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Government
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Law Enforcement
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Notices
Police Conduct
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Violence
Certifications
Collective Bargaining
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Government
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Law Enforcement
Mediation
Mental and Behavioral Health
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Notices
Police Conduct
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Public Safety | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |