MD SB392 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Cecil County a refillable container license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of a Class A or Class B alcoholic beverages license; specifying that a holder of the license may sell draft beer for consumption off the licensed premises in a specified refillable container; requiring a refillable container to meet specified requirements; requiring an applicant for a license to complete a form and pay a fee; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424531/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Cecil County
Fees
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Cecil County
Fees
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations