MD SB394 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records based on a conviction for certain criminal boating offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-5) (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (127-5)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {938175/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-04SenateHearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback