MD SB396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a 3-year payment deferral under specified circumstances for Maryland estate tax imposed on qualified agricultural property passing from a decedent to or for the use of an individual who enters into an agreement to use the property for farming purposes after the decedent's death; providing that Maryland estate tax subject to a payment deferral shall become due immediately if the qualified recipient ceases to use the property for farming purposes before the tax is paid; applying the Act to decedents dying after 2010; etc.
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Pilot Program for Payment Deferral for Qualified
Sponsors
Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] |
Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Hixson) Adopted (139-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |