MD SB396 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of the term "court" to include an orphans' court or a court exercising the jurisdiction of an orphans' court for the purposes of the Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act.
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Orphans' Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |