MD SB396 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the jurisdiction of an equity court to include custody or guardianship of an immigrant child pursuant to a motion for Special Immigrant Juvenile factual findings requesting a specified determination; and defining the term "child" to mean an unmarried individual under the age of 21 years under specified circumstances.
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-44) (Y: 88 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-44) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808870/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Aliens and Citizenship
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Courts
Family Law
Guardians
Jurisdiction
Minors
Petitions
Youth
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Courts
Family Law
Guardians
Jurisdiction
Minors
Petitions
Youth