MD SB396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each public body to designate at least one individual who is an employee, an officer, or a member of the public body to receive training on the requirements of the open meetings law; and applying the Act only to a public body that meets in a closed session on or after October 1, 2017.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Training - Application
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-0) (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-0) (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |