MD SB396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB273
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of cases in which the State may appeal from a decision of a trial court under certain circumstances; establishing, altering, and clarifying penalties for and elements of certain firearm-related crimes; prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a certain defendant charged with a certain firearm-related crime under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB423 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
SB273 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
SB273 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appeals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Dealers
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Evidence
Guns
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Violence
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Dealers
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Evidence
Guns
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Repeat Offenders
Theft
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 12 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 7 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 144 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0396?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0396f.pdf |