MD SB399 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a claim for damages due to medical injury to be referred to the Director of the Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office to select an independent medical review panel if a defendant asserts as a defense that specified clinical practice guidelines apply and the defendant acted in accordance with the guidelines; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations establishing clinical practice guidelines for obstetrical and gynecological services; etc.
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Malpractice
Physicians
Public Health
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Women
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Malpractice
Physicians
Public Health
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Women