MD SB4 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership, powers, and duties of the Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities; requiring the Oversight Committee to evaluate the progress in improving nursing home care quality and assisted living facility quality statewide; requiring the Oversight Committee to review changes made to the membership and duties of the Oversight Committee and make recommendations on legislative changes that may be necessary to certain committees of the General Assembly by November 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {116387/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827970/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Inspections
Legislation
Nursing Homes
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Elderly
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Inspections
Legislation
Nursing Homes
Reports
Rules and Regulations