MD SB402 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a motor carrier permit is not required for a local public transportation system established under a law enacted by the local governing body of a county or municipal corporation; providing that a motor carrier permit is not required for a motor vehicle used by a privately owned transportation company exclusively to provide transportation system services under a specified contract; requiring a privately owned transportation company to obtain a specified motor carrier permit; and repealing exemptions for particular counties.
Title
Motor Carrier Companies - Local Public Transportation Systems - Exemption from
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Floor Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-04 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |