MD SB41 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Nurse Multistate Licensure Compact to the Nurse Licensure Compact; altering the findings of the party states to the Compact; providing that a multistate license to practice specified types of nursing issued by a home state to a resident in that state will be recognized by each party state for a specified purpose; providing that the party states create and establish a joint public entity known as the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators; providing a specified contingency; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {746986/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nurses
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nurses
Residency
Rules and Regulations