MD SB412 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of a county's mental health advisory committee by including an individual with experience with mental health care for veterans or individuals serving in the military on the list of groups from which individuals may be appointed to the committee by the governing body of the county.
Title
Mental Health Law - County Mental Health Advisory Committees - Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Gile [D] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB408 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Veterans
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |