MD SB417 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the Public Service Commission must notify the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of the Environment about an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity associated with power plant construction; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to complete an independent environmental and socioeconomic project assessment report within 6 months after the Commission determines the application to be complete; etc.
Title
Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-11) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334135/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334135/1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Certifications
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Flood Control
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
Time
Utility Regulation
Water
Wetlands
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Flood Control
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
Time
Utility Regulation
Water
Wetlands
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 3 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |