MD SB425 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that secondary schools participating in the Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program may serve breakfast in any broadly accessible part of the school; and authorizing elementary schools participating in the Program, subject to certain approval and allowances, to serve breakfast in any broadly accessible part of the school, including from "Grab and Go" carts after the arrival of students to the school, provided that students are allowed to consume the meal in the classroom after the start of the school day.
Title
Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Alterations (Maryland Meals for Achievement Flexibility Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263320/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB386 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Education
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Private Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools
Education
Food
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Private Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools