MD SB426 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $45,000 to $65,000, the limitation on the survivability of the right to compensation for permanent total disability payable under specified provisions of law; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |