MD SB432 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2018, and January 1, 2019, and a maximum of $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2020, and for each taxable year thereafter; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |