MD SB432 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to collaborate with an institution of higher education or a designated federal or national research entity to study the effectiveness and impact of active shooter safety drills or trainings by researching and analyzing data collected by local school systems; requiring the Center to identify best practices for active shooter safety drills or trainings on or before October 1, 2024; requiring local school systems to provide parents with the annual active shooter safety drill schedule; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Active Shooter Safety Drills or Trainings - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {913527/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB416 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Guns
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Physically Disabled Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
Storage
Students
studies
Teachers
Trauma Informed Approach
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Guns
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Physically Disabled Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
Standards and Best Practices
State Police, Department of
Storage
Students
studies
Teachers
Trauma Informed Approach
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |