MD SB433 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations to require certain bidders, contractors, and subcontractors to pay certain employee health care expenses; requiring the Department of General Services, by regulation, to establish certain procedures to certify that a bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a procurement officer to void a contract if a certain bidder fails to submit certain records within a reasonable period of time; etc.
Title
State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-15) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-37) (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-37) (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-15) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-37) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {936186/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624233/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Certifications
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Fines
Forms
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Health
Health Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Commerce and Business
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Fines
Forms
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Health
Health Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor and Employment