MD SB436 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Caroline County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Caroline County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Kent County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Kent County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Dorchester County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; and applying the Act.
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {343320/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808870/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Caroline County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dorchester County
Kent County
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dorchester County
Kent County
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs