MD SB446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Higher Education to require certain institutions of postsecondary education to refund all tuition and fees to certain Maryland students under certain circumstances; establishing that an institution that closes programs in a manner that is a disorderly closure is in violation of the enrollment agreement or other contract with an enrolled student; authorizing the Commission to approve a certain plan for the of filing certain records of former students with a certain successor institution; etc.
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Solomon) Adopted (Y: 110 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Floor Amendment 653026/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Solomon) Adopted (Y: 110 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Floor Amendment 653026/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-32) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Solomon) Adopted (110-18) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {814161/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-8) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Floor Amendment {653026/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204932/1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB469 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Bonds
Certifications
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Curriculum
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Communication
Exemptions
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Judgments
Loans
Partnerships
Private Schools
Public Officials
Records
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students
Teachers
Time
Tuition
Certifications
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Curriculum
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Communication
Exemptions
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Judgments
Loans
Partnerships
Private Schools
Public Officials
Records
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Signatures
Students
Teachers
Time
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |