MD SB448 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law that limit the wine sampling privileges of licensed wineries in Talbot County; and clarifying that the statewide wine sampling privileges of licensed wineries apply in Talbot County by repealing a specified inconsistent provision relating to Talbot County.
Title
Talbot County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-09 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |