MD SB463 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $16,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Carroll County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (136-2) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Carroll County
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Fire Protection
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Volunteers
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Fire Protection
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Volunteers