MD SB47 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing prohibitions and requirements regarding the sale of diet pills to individuals under the age of 18 years; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop a notice with information about the potential health risks of diet pills; and authorizing the Department to establish limitations on which diet pills are subject to the Act.
Title
Public Health - Sale of Diet Pills to Minors - Prohibition (Protecting Teenagers From Unregulated Diet Pills)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB634 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Subjects
Data
Delivery Services
Drugs
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Labeling
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Delivery Services
Drugs
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Labeling
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 21 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 259.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |