MD SB478 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to research and explore ways to reduce the flammability of the plastic components contained in school bus engine compartments and report the results to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2012.
Title
Education - School Buses - Fire Safety Standards for Engine Components - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (31-14) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Astle) Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 304631/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:20 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/15 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Fire Protection
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Reports
Safety
School Buses