MD SB478 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, after an annexation resolution is introduced, the chief executive or the administrative officer of the municipality shall notify commercial property owners in the area to be annexed of all personal property taxes and fees imposed by the municipality and the date, time, and place of the public hearing on the annexation; providing, in the taxable year beginning July 1, 2019, up to a 100% property tax credit that a county or municipal corporation is required to grant for the property tax imposed on certain vehicles; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax – Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business and Notification on Annexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {445666/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateLaid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {583725/1 (Senator Peters)
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {819435/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-20SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-02-20SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0478&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0478f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0478t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0478e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_250_sb0478e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0478_58372501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0478_81943501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0478_44566601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0478.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0478_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0623.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0478_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0944.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback