MD SB482 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing, from $1,000 to $500, the minimum value of property or services the theft of which renders the crime a felony.
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Theft - Threshold Value
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. George Edwards [R] |
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0482.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0482f.pdf |