MD SB483 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the term limit for the youth members of the Maryland Youth Advisory Council.
Title
Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Term Limit of Youth Members - Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |