MD SB488 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain designations on a marriage license and certificate; and authorizing the clerk of the circuit court to maintain a certain electronic record as an alternative to the requirement that the clerk keep a certain marriage license book.
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB449 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 2 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |