MD SB489 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the topics that may be included in certain training required for each trustee on the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and providing that the Board of Trustees may satisfy a requirement to provide each member and retiree in the several systems with a personal statement that includes certain information about the several systems and the member's or retiree's benefits by providing each member and retiree the information through an online portal.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Responsibilities and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433620/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB625 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Data
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
International Affairs
internet
Job Training
Records
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Data
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
International Affairs
internet
Job Training
Records
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |