MD SB490 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the definition of "Consumer Price Index" to replace the 1967 index with the 1982-1984 index as the reference used by the State Retirement and Pension System for certain calculations.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Consumer Price Index - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB629 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 29 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |