MD SB494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence to study and develop specified strategies and recommendations for advancing telemedicine technologies and use.
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {247479/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health
Health Occupations
Physicians
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology