MD SB5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to additional residential real property the property tax credit in Harford County for specified residential real property in proximity to specified refuse disposal systems.
Title
Harford County Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-10 | Favorable with Amendments 729133/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/1 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-09-30 | Pre-filed |