MD SB512 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a public service company from terminating electric or gas service to certain residential customers for nonpayment on a day that a government shutdown is in effect and for 7 days after the government shutdown has ended; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain court to stay certain proceedings for the foreclosure or repossession of certain residential property for a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-32) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (107-32)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-25HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {227275/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-15SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0512&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0512f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0512t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_522_sb0512t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0512_22727501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0512.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0512_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0512_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0638.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0512_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0512_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1501.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback