MD SB520 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using, selling, or distributing commercial feed or drinking water intended for a specified use that contains specified antimicrobial drugs on or after October 1, 2016.
Title
Agriculture - Commercial Feed and Drinking Water - Antimicrobial Drug Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |