MD SB523 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a health occupations board from denying a license, certification, or registration to an immigrant if the individual meets all educational, training, or professional requirements; and requiring each health occupations board to require each applicant for a license to disclose the Social Security number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number of the applicant and record the number on the application.
Title
Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-15) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593321/1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB523 (Carry Over) 2022-04-07 - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
HB533 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB533 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Business Regulation
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Immigrants and Citizenship
Licenses
Registration
Residency
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Immigrants and Citizenship
Licenses
Registration
Residency
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 8 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |