MD SB528 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a minimum amount of $300 that is subject to forfeiture in connection with a controlled dangerous substance violation under specified circumstances; prohibiting a seizing authority or prosecuting authority from directly or indirectly transferring seized property to a federal law enforcement authority or agency, with a specified exception; requiring the seizing authority, within 30 days after the seizure of property, to send by first-class mail specified written information to the owner of the seized property; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {823521/1 Rejected (10-36) (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {823521/1 Rejected (10-36) (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-51) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {572514/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {823521/1 Rejected (10-36) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {318271/1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {318271/1 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Animals
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Court Costs
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fire Protection
Forfeiture
Forms
Gangs
Guns
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Personal Property
Police Training Commission
Postal Service
Public Information
Real Property
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Victims
Weapons
Witnesses
Animals
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Court Costs
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Federal Government
Fees
Fire Protection
Forfeiture
Forms
Gangs
Guns
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Personal Property
Police Training Commission
Postal Service
Public Information
Real Property
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Search and Seizure
Substance Abuse
Victims
Weapons
Witnesses