MD SB536 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014, on the implementation of a system of graduated responses for children under the jurisdiction of the Department.
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Graduated Responses - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |