MD SB54 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting certain incorrect cross-references for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to accountable care organizations, incentive-based compensation, and the renewal of certain health benefit plans; altering the triggering events for which certain carriers are required to provide a certain open enrollment period; and altering the definition of "small employer" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange.
Title
Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {267173/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Corrective Legislation
Federal Government
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Salaries and Compensation
Federal Government
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Salaries and Compensation