MD SB546 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exception to the immunity from civil and criminal action for specified government officials for words spoken at specified meetings.
Title
Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for Bribery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Bribery
Civil Actions
Counties
County Commissioners
County Councils
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Ethics
Liability
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Public Officials
Civil Actions
Counties
County Commissioners
County Councils
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Ethics
Liability
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Public Officials