MD SB546 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1475
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; requiring by August 1, 2022, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2021, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion; etc.
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904833/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
HB1475 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
HB1475 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weights and Measures
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 6 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 6 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |