MD SB55 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that a solicitor for a private career school located outside the State obtain a permit from the Maryland Higher Education Commission.
Title
Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |