MD SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain provision of law relating to the submission of certain plans to the Department of Planning; clarifying that the Department is the depository for all land use plans, amendments, and revisions adopted by certain entities in the State; requiring a certain unit of government or a certain agency to submit to the Department a current version of all adopted land use plans, amendments, and revisions; and requiring the Department to post on its website a copy of certain land use plans, amendments, and revisions.
Title
Department of Planning - Central Depository
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634335/1 Report Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
internet
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Zoning and Planning
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
internet
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Zoning and Planning