MD SB562 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to disclose to a victim or victim's representative the home address, school, or place of employment of a child respondent on probation under specified circumstances; requiring a confinement unit to disclose to a victim or victim's representative the home address, school, or place of employment of a child respondent under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Juvenile Sex Crime Victims' Rights Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 618871/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Disclosure
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Records
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Records
Sexual Offenses
Victims