MD SB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, in Prince George's County, the zoning hearing examiner shall issue a decision on a zoning matter not more than 30 days after the matter is remanded and relevant information is received from the applicant or the district council; altering the circumstances under which a specified person or entity aggrieved by a specified decision of the district council may request judicial review of any final decision of the district council.
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {850117/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864831/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appeals
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Hearings
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
Hearings
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning