MD SB567 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB418
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to jointly conduct a study of the assessment of agricultural accessory use improvements to review whether agricultural accessory use improvements should be assessed using a different methodology from improvements located on nonagricultural land; and requiring the departments to submit a joint report of their findings and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173920/1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {813429/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB567 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
HB1282 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Referred Rules
HB1282 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-07 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Emergency Bills
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Tourism
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Emergency Bills
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Tourism
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 8 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |